Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoni Dominik Tyszkiewicz

Deceased

Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1692³BornLohojscen
1715¹22.9Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jul 173947.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine
20 Jul 173947.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Mennith
11 Oct 173947.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mennith
16 Feb 174048.0SelectedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
16 Sep 174048.6ConfirmedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
31 Jan 176270.0DiedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoni Dominik Tyszkiewicz:
Bishop Antoni Dominik Tyszkiewicz (born , died ) Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 286, and Page 365
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 454
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 17 Nov 2015