Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo Emilio Filonardi

Deceased

Archbishop of Amalfi, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Feb 1616AppointedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
5 Apr 1616Ordained BishopArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
19 Apr 1616AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
26 Mar 1621ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
24 Apr 1624DiedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Emilio Filonardi
Archbishop Paolo Emilio Filonardi (died ) Archbishop of Amalfi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 80
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 60, Number 344
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1616, Number 9
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 266

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast