Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Santiago Creus y Martí

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarragona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1760³BornMataró
10 Jul 181555.0AppointedBishop of Menorca, Spain
22 Oct 181555.3Ordained BishopBishop of Menorca, Spain
29 May 182059.9AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
17 Sep 182565.2DiedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Santiago Creus y Martí:
Archbishop Santiago Creus y Martí (born , died ) Archbishop of Tarragona

  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1815, Number 47
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 266, and Page 360
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 132, Number 710

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015