Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Strauch y Vidal, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Vic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1760³BornTarragona
23 Sep 181655.9AppointedBishop of Vic, Spain
12 Jan 181756.2Ordained BishopBishop of Vic, Spain
16 Apr 182362.4DiedBishop of Vic, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ramón Strauch y Vidal:
Bishop Ramón Strauch y Vidal O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Vic

  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 395
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 135, Number 726

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015