Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ignatius Cardinal Kung Pin-mei

Deceased

Bishop of Shanghai [Shanghai]

Cardinal-Priest of San Sisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1901BornP'ou-tong
28 May 193028.8Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jun 194947.9AppointedBishop of Suzhou [Soochow], China
7 Oct 194948.2Ordained BishopBishop of Suzhou [Soochow], China
15 Jul 195049.0AppointedBishop of Shanghai [Shanghai], China
30 Jun 197977.9Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
28 Jun 199189.9Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 199189.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
12 Mar 200098.6DiedBishop of Shanghai [Shanghai], China

MicroData Summary for Ignatius Kung Pin-mei:
Cardinal Ignatius Kung Pin-mei (born , died ) Bishop of Shanghai [Shanghai]

  • a priest for 69.8 years
  • a bishop for 50.4 years
  • a cardinal for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 91
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013