Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignacio Gregorio Larrañaga Lasa, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pingliang [Pingliang], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1892Born
19029.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
19 Apr 191926.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
29 Apr 193037.5AppointedPrefect of Pingliang [Pingliang], China
25 Jun 195057.7AppointedBishop of Pingliang [Pingliang], China
1 Oct 195057.9Ordained BishopBishop of Pingliang [Pingliang], China
18 Feb 197582.3DiedBishop of Pingliang [Pingliang], China

MicroData Summary
Ignacio Gregorio Larrañaga Lasa
Bishop Ignacio Gregorio Larrañaga Lasa O.F.M. Cap.
(born , died )
Bishop of Pingliang [Pingliang]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAldaba, Diocese of Vitoria, Spain
Ordained BishopSaint Peter, Church, Shanghai, Diocese of Shanghai [Shanghai]
Death PlaceFuenterrabia, Spain

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1950, Number 79
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 17 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025