Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephan Nebelmair

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg

Titular Bishop of Halmiros


Events

DateEventTitle
1590Ordained PriestPriest
27 Feb 1606AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
27 Feb 1606AppointedTitular Bishop of Halmiros
2 Jul 1606Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Halmiros
3 Dec 1618DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Stephan Nebelmair:
Bishop Stephan Nebelmair (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg

  • a priest for 28.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 79
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1606, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 9 Feb 2015