Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Archbishop Paul Kong Ling-zhong], P.S.S. †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Archbishop of Kunming [Kunming], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1905²Born
15 Jun 195853.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Kunming [Kunming], China
30 Oct 1992³87.8DiedArchbishop of Kunming [Kunming], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul Kong Ling-zhong
Archbishop Paul Kong Ling-zhong P.S.S. (born 1905, died ) Archbishop of Kunming [Kunming]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopGuiyang, Archdiocese of Guiyang [Kweyang]
Death PlaceKunming, Archdiocese of Kunming [Kunming]

  • a bishop for 34.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14*, Number 11
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 181, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • fn/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast