Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Kazuo Koda

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Tōkyō, Japan

Titular Bishop of Synnada in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1955 Born
3 Mar 198529.9Ordained PriestPriest of Tōkyō, Japan
29 Nov 200449.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tōkyō, Japan
29 Nov 200449.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Synnada in Mauretania
19 Feb 200549.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Synnada in Mauretania
23 Jun 201863.2ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Tōkyō, Japan

MicroData Summary for James Kazuo Koda
Bishop James Kazuo Koda (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Tōkyō

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChiba

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Tōkyō.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,824
  • r: Bollettino, 23 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 23 Jun 2018

Quantcast