Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vahan Kitchourian

Deceased

Archbishop of Istanbul (Armenian), Turkey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1874Born
3 May 193055.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Istanbul (Armenian), Turkey
3 May 193055.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Colonia in Armenia
20 Jul 193056.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Colonia in Armenia
8 Jun 193157.0SucceededArchbishop of Istanbul (Armenian), Turkey
28 Mar 193661.8DiedArchbishop of Istanbul (Armenian), Turkey

MicroData Summary for Vahan Kitchourian
Archbishop Vahan Kitchourian (born , died ) Archbishop of Istanbul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceErzerum

  • a bishop for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast