Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lavrentij Druckyj Sokolynskyj, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Smoleńsk (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1681Born
Jan 1709³27.0Ordained PriestPriest
1719¹37.0AppointedBishop of Smoleńsk (Ukrainian), Poland
15 May 171937.4Ordained BishopBishop of Smoleńsk (Ukrainian), Poland
15 May 172745.4DiedBishop of Smoleńsk (Ukrainian), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lavrentij Druckyj Sokolynskyj:
Bishop Lavrentij Druckyj Sokolynskyj O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Smoleńsk

  • a priest for 18.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 290
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1719, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015