Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Kilduff

Deceased

Bishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1820Born
19 Dec 184626.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
11 Jul 184726.6Ordained PriestPriest
29 Apr 185332.4AppointedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
29 Jun 185332.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
21 Jun 186746.6DiedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland

MicroData Summary for John Kilduff (VIAF: 315679402)
Bishop John Kilduff (born , died ) Bishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBushfield, Athlone
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Church, Phibsboro, Archdiocese of Dublin

  • a priest for 19.9 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1861
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 117
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1853, Number 24
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 41, Number 2,584

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 23 May 2020

Quantcast