Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Khoury

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Maron de Montréal (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1936BornBehwaita
19 Dec 196428.1Ordained PriestPriest
29 Apr 199356.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop
29 Apr 199356.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Chonochora
4 Sep 199356.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chonochora
11 Nov 199660.0AppointedBishop of Saint-Maron de Montréal (Maronite), Canada
10 Jan 201376.1RetiredBishop of Saint-Maron de Montréal (Maronite), Canada
17 Nov 201680.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint-Maron de Montréal (Maronite), Canada

MicroData Summary for Joseph Khoury
Bishop Joseph Khoury (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Maron de Montréal

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,129
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Jan 2013
  • d: CB, 17 Nov 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Nov 2016