Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Chucrallah-Nabil El-Hage

Archbishop Emeritus of Tyr (Maronite), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1943 Born
13 Jun 197027.2Ordained PriestPriest
Jun 200360.2SelectedArchbishop of Tyr (Maronite), Lebanon
25 Sep 200360.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Tyr (Maronite), Lebanon
29 Nov 200360.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tyr (Maronite), Lebanon
1 Nov 202077.6RetiredArchbishop of Tyr (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Chucrallah-Nabil El-Hage
Archbishop Chucrallah-Nabil El-Hage (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Tyr

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHajjé
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame du Liban, Basilica, Harissa

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Tyr (Maronite).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,486
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 240, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 26 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Jan 2021

Quantcast