Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine de Coues

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Condom


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1573BornTreignac
15 Mar 160431.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Condom, France
15 Mar 160431.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Auzia
28 Mar 160431.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Auzia
1616²42.9SucceededBishop of Condom, France
1647²73.9ResignedBishop of Condom, France
15 Feb 164875.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Condom, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoine de Coues:
Bishop Antoine de Coues (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Condom

  • a bishop for 43.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 103, and Page 159
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 40, Number 213
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1604, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 2 Mar 2015