Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre de Donnauld, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mirepoix, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1563Born
11 Sep 158724.4AppointedBishop of Mirepoix, France
27 Sep 158724.4Ordained BishopBishop of Mirepoix, France
3 Jul 163067.2DiedBishop of Mirepoix, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Donnauld
Bishop Pierre de Donnauld O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Mirepoix

EventPlace
Birth PlaceS. Ybars
Ordained BishopS. Louis des Français, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceMirepoix, Diocese of Mirepoix

  • a bishop for 42.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 246
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1587, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 27 Nov 2017