Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspard Dinet

Deceased

Bishop of Mâcon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1569BornMoulins
2 Aug 159930.5AppointedBishop of Mâcon, France
6 Jan 160031.0Ordained BishopBishop of Mâcon, France
30 Nov 161950.8DiedBishop of Mâcon, France

MicroData Summary for Gaspard Dinet:
Bishop Gaspard Dinet (born , died ) Bishop of Mâcon

  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 235
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1600, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015