Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cyrus de Thiard de Bissy

Deceased

Bishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1562¹Born
24 Jan 159432.0AppointedBishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France
20 Feb 159432.1Ordained BishopBishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France
3 Jan 162462.0DiedBishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cyrus de Thiard de Bissy (VIAF: 12638807)
Bishop Cyrus de Thiard de Bissy (born 1562, died ) Bishop of Chalons-sur-Saône

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Louis des Francais, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceChalons, Diocese of Chalons-sur-Saône

  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 125
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 144
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1594, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast