Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Raymond

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Papoul


Events

DateEventTitle
28 May 1601AppointedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
13 Oct 1602Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
15 Nov 1604DiedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Raymond:
Bishop Jean Raymond (died ) Bishop of Saint-Papoul

  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1602, Number 24
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 273

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 5 Feb 2015