Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thaddeus Joseph Jakubowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Chicago, Illinois

Titular Bishop of Plestia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1924BornChicago
3 May 195026.0Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
16 Feb 198863.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
16 Feb 198863.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Plestia
11 Apr 198864.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Plestia
24 Jan 200378.8RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
14 Jul 201389.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Chicago, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Thaddeus Joseph Jakubowski:
Bishop Thaddeus Joseph Jakubowski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Chicago

  • a priest for 63.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,621
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 15 Jul 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015