Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine-Xavier Maynaud de Pancemont

Deceased

Bishop of Vannes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1756BornDigoin
178124.4Ordained PriestPriest
9 Apr 180245.7SelectedBishop of Vannes, France
10 Apr 180245.7ConfirmedBishop of Vannes, France
11 Apr 180245.7Ordained BishopBishop of Vannes, France
14 Mar 180750.6DiedBishop of Vannes, France

MicroData Summary for Antoine-Xavier Maynaud de Pancemont:
Bishop Antoine-Xavier Maynaud de Pancemont (born , died ) Bishop of Vannes

  • a priest for 26.2 years
  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 390

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013