Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andreas Stanislaus von Hattynski (Hatten)

Deceased

Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1763BornKalkstein
1 Apr 178622.6Ordained PriestPriest of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
11 Aug 180036.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
11 Aug 180036.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Diana
11 Oct 180138.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Diana
26 Apr 183773.7SelectedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
2 Oct 183774.1ConfirmedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
3 Jan 184177.3DiedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

MicroData Summary for Andreas Stanislaus von Hattynski (Hatten):
Bishop Andreas Stanislaus von Hattynski (Hatten) (born , died ) Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)

  • a priest for 54.8 years
  • a bishop for 39.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 176, and Page 389
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,962

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 14 Jan 2014