Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André-Etienne-Athanase Hermel, SS.CC. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Tahiti {Isole Tahiti}, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)

Titular Bishop of Casius


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1873Born
25 Jul 189724.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
15 May 190532.0AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Tahiti {Isole Tahiti}, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)
15 May 190532.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Casius
27 Aug 190532.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Casius
26 Feb 190834.8SucceededVicar Apostolic of Tahiti {Isole Tahiti}, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)
20 Feb 193258.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Tahiti {Isole Tahiti}, French Polynesia, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for André-Etienne-Athanase Hermel
Bishop André-Etienne-Athanase Hermel SS.CC. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Tahiti {Isole Tahiti}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFécamp, France

  • a priest for 34.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c23: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1905, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast