Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Henrici, S.J.

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Chur

Titular Bishop of Absorus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1928 BornZürich
194718.8ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
23 Jul 195830.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
4 Mar 199364.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chur, Switzerland
4 Mar 199364.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Absorus
31 May 199365.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Absorus
5 Feb 200778.8RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Chur, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Peter Henrici:
Bishop Peter Henrici S.J. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Chur

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chur.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Feb 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,075
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013