Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Kautschitz

Deceased

Bishop of Ljubljana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1743³BornIdria
20 Oct 176117.9ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
14 Nov 177329.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Society of Jesus
30 Nov 177330.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
177733.1IncardinatedPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
23 Sep 180561.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
23 Sep 180561.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Zela
3 Nov 180561.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zela
15 Jul 180763.6SelectedBishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
24 Aug 180763.7ConfirmedBishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
17 Mar 181470.3DiedBishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anton Kautschitz:
Bishop Anton Kautschitz (born , died ) Bishop of Ljubljana

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 402, and Page 228

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013