Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Harrison Abello, O. de M. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Bom Jesus do Piauí, Piaui

Titular Bishop of Podalia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1887BornConcepción, Chile
24 Sep 190316.3ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
25 Mar 190719.8Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
2 Jan 191022.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
12 Nov 192639.4AppointedPrelate of Bom Jesus do Piauí, Piaui, Brazil
12 Nov 192639.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Podalia
1 May 192739.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Podalia
10 Oct 192740.3InstalledPrelate of Bom Jesus do Piauí, Piaui, Brazil
1928²40.5ResignedPrelate of Bom Jesus do Piauí, Piaui, Brazil
9 Aug 194962.1DiedPrelate Emeritus of Bom Jesus do Piauí, Piaui, Brazil

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ramón Harrison Abello:
Bishop Ramón Harrison Abello O. de M. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Bom Jesus do Piauí

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013