Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Gottfried von Guttenberg

Deceased

Bishop of Würzburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1645³Born
16 Oct 168439.0SelectedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
12 Aug 168640.8ConfirmedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
22 Dec 168641.2Ordained PriestPriest
29 Dec 168641.2Ordained BishopBishop of Würzburg, Germany
14 Dec 169853.1DiedBishop of Würzburg, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Gottfried von Guttenberg (VIAF: 25388614)
Bishop Johann Gottfried von Guttenberg (born , died ) Bishop of Würzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarloffstein

  • a priest for 11.9 years
  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1686, Number 20
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 218
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,604
  • b/c2+: ATh
  • c1: CB, 27 Oct 2017
  • c1: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast