Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Isidoro Clemente Gutiérrez, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Amoy

Titular Bishop of Augile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1853BornMontehermoso, Spain
1877¹23.7ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
15 Mar 188228.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
8 Aug 189946.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Amoy, China
8 Aug 189946.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Augile
11 Mar 190046.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Augile
10 Aug 191562.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Amoy, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Isidoro Clemente Gutiérrez:
Bishop Isidoro Clemente Gutiérrez O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Amoy

  • a priest for 33.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 130
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013