Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Izquierdo y Tavira, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lugo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1686BornLos Hinojosos del Orden
16 Sep 174861.9AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
10 Nov 174862.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lugo, Spain
6 Jan 176275.3DiedBishop of Lugo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Izquierdo y Tavira:
Bishop Francisco Izquierdo y Tavira O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Lugo

  • a bishop for 13.2 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,545
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 66, Number 311

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 23 Oct 2013