Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anselmo Gómez de la Torre, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tui


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1636BornCasar de Periedo-Cabezón
1661²24.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
7 Nov 168952.9AppointedBishop of Tui, Spain
12 Feb 169053.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tui, Spain
15 Dec 172084.0ResignedBishop of Tui, Spain
4 Feb 172285.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Tui, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anselmo Gómez de la Torre:
Bishop Anselmo Gómez de la Torre O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tui

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 394
  • bd/op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 231, Number 1,440
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1690, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015