Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Horacio Gomez González

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Puerto Gaitán, Colombia

Titular Bishop of Liberalia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1958Born
30 Nov 199133.1Ordained PriestPriest of Manizales, Colombia
10 Jul 201455.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Puerto Gaitán, Colombia
10 Jul 201455.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Liberalia
21 Aug 201455.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Liberalia
10 Sep 201455.8InstalledVicar Apostolic of Puerto Gaitán, Colombia
8 Apr 201657.4ResignedVicar Apostolic of Puerto Gaitán, Colombia
17 Apr 201657.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Puerto Gaitán, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Luis Horacio Gomez González (VIAF: 86971020)
Bishop Luis Horacio Gomez González (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Puerto Gaitán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalaminas - Caldas

  • a priest for 24.3 years
  • a bishop for 1.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Jul 2014
  • ob/i: CB, 31 Jul 2014
  • c2+: CB, 12 Aug 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,268
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Apr 2016
  • d: CB, 18 Apr 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017