Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Tommaso Pasquale Cardinal Gizzi

Deceased

Secretary Emeritus of the Secretariat of State

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana

Apostolic Delegate to Other

Titular See: (adel/Ancona)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1787Born
27 May 180921.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
2 Sep 181022.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 Aug 182739.9AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Switzerland
15 Sep 182840.9ResignedApostolic Internuncio to Switzerland
5 Jan 182941.2AppointedOfficial to Sardinia, Italy
25 Jan 183547.3AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Belgium
21 Nov 183750.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to Other
18 Feb 183951.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thebae
21 Apr 183951.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thebae
31 May 183951.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
23 Apr 184153.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Sardinia, Italy
12 Jul 184153.8Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
21 Jan 184456.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Sardinia, Italy
22 Jan 184456.3Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jan 184456.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
1 Aug 184658.8AppointedSecretary of State
5 Jul 184759.7ResignedSecretary of State
3 Jun 184961.6DiedSecretary Emeritus of the Secretariat of State

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Pasquale Gizzi (VIAF: 263096150)
Tommaso Pasquale Cardinal Gizzi (born , died ) Secretary Emeritus of State

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCeccano, Diocese of Ferentino, Italy
Ordained BishopTor de’ Specchi, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceLenola, Diocese of Fondi (Fundi), Italy
Buried Place (Original)S.Maria Maggiore, Lenola, Italy
Buried Place (Current)Cappella dei Conti Gizzi, Monumental, Cemetery, Ceccano, Diocese of Ferentino, Italy

  • a priest for 38.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
  • a cardinal for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 365
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1839, Number 2
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Jul 1841
  • xsta/nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 10, and Page 61, and Page 245
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 252, and Page 253

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast