Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joannes Karski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno

Titular Bishop of Ionopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1726³BornZakliczewo
7 Jul 175427.7Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jul 177144.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
29 Jul 177144.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Ionopolis
15 Nov 177246.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ionopolis
7 May 178558.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Joannes Karski:
Bishop Joannes Karski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno

  • a priest for 30.8 years
  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 244, and Page 454
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1772, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 16 Dec 2015