Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Arnulf Giedroyć

Deceased

Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1754BornKossakowszczyzna-Giedrojcie
6 Jan 178126.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Jan 178126.5Ordained PriestPriest
4 Dec 179036.3SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
11 Apr 179136.7ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
11 Apr 179136.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Orthosias in Caria
19 Jun 179136.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Orthosias in Caria
13 May 180247.8SucceededBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
17 Jul 183883.9DiedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Józef Arnulf Giedroyć
Bishop Józef Arnulf Giedroyć (born , died ) Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 47.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,768
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 320, and Page 365
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 332
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016