Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam Kościa

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)

Titular Bishop of Dioclea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1731³BornWierchowicz
19 Jun 178049.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
19 Jun 178049.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Dioclea
10 Sep 178049.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dioclea
16 Oct 179160.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Adam Kościa:
Bishop Adam Kościa (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)

  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 197, and Page 454
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,902
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1780, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015