Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefano Ghirardelli

Deceased

Bishop of Alatri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1633¹BornRoma
14 Jun 168350.4AppointedBishop of Alatri, Italy
20 Jun 168350.4Ordained BishopBishop of Alatri, Italy
Feb 1708³75.0DiedBishop of Alatri, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stefano Ghirardelli:
Bishop Stefano Ghirardelli (born 1633, died Feb 1708) Bishop of Alatri

  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 74
  • c34: CB, 1 Jun 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1683, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015