Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Evangelist Maria Gföllner

Deceased

Bishop of Linz, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1867Born
28 Oct 189325.8Ordained PriestPriest of Linz, Austria
16 Jul 191547.5SelectedBishop of Linz, Austria
19 Aug 191547.6ConfirmedBishop of Linz, Austria
18 Oct 191547.8Ordained BishopBishop of Linz, Austria
3 Jun 194173.4DiedBishop of Linz, Austria

MicroData Summary for Johannes Evangelist Maria Gföllner
Bishop Johannes Evangelist Maria Gföllner (born , died ) Bishop of Linz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWaizenkirchen

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018