Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo Patricio Fava Ghisleri

Deceased

Archbishop of Ferrara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1728BornPiacenza
24 Aug 180778.7AppointedArchbishop of Ferrara, Italy
4 Oct 180778.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Ferrara, Italy
14 Aug 182293.6DiedArchbishop of Ferrara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Patricio Fava Ghisleri:
Archbishop Paolo Patricio Fava Ghisleri (born , died ) Archbishop of Ferrara

  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 193

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013