Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Gabriele Gautieri, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen

Titular Bishop of Cardicium


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Dec 1671ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
21 Mar 1676Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
16 Dec 1704AppointedVicar Apostolic of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
2 Mar 1705AppointedTitular Bishop of Cardicium
29 May 1707Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cardicium

MicroData Summary for Angelo Gabriele Gautieri:
Bishop Angelo Gabriele Gautieri O.F.M. Vicar Apostolic of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1707
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 143, and Page 386

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013