Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mariano Garnica y Orjuela, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Antioquía


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1770¹BornChiquinquirá
21 May 182757.3AppointedBishop of Antioquía, Colombia
23 Mar 182858.2Ordained BishopBishop of Antioquía, Colombia
10 Aug 183262.6DiedBishop of Antioquía, Colombia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mariano Garnica y Orjuela
Bishop Mariano Garnica y Orjuela O.P. (born 1770, died ) Bishop of Antioquía

  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 80
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1828, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Jun 2016