Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Fernández Torres

Deceased

Bishop of Ceuta, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1717Born
17 Jun 177154.1AppointedBishop of Ceuta, Spain
4 Aug 177154.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ceuta, Spain
6 Sep 177356.4DiedBishop of Ceuta, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Fernández Torres
Bishop Manuel Fernández Torres (born , died ) Bishop of Ceuta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFontiveros

  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 88, Number 450
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1771, Number 10
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 377

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast