Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Denys Gaith, B.C. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Homs (-Hama-Jabrud) (Melkite Greek), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1910Born
8 Sep 193727.4Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Chouerite Order of Saint John the Baptist (Melkite Greek)
19 Aug 197161.4AppointedArchbishop of Homs (-Hama-Jabrud) (Melkite Greek), Syria
12 Sep 197161.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Homs (-Hama-Jabrud) (Melkite Greek), Syria
22 Mar 198676.0DiedArchbishop of Homs (-Hama-Jabrud) (Melkite Greek), Syria

MicroData Summary for Denys Gaith
Archbishop Denys Gaith B.C. (born , died ) Archbishop of Homs (-Hama-Jabrud)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYabroud
Ordained BishopSaint-Constantin et Sainte-Hélène, Church, Yabroud

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 21, Number 1,145
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 46, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast