Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl Friedrich von Wendt

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim

Titular Bishop of Basilinopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1748BornPapenhausen
6 Apr 177728.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Hildesheim, Germany
8 Apr 177728.4Ordained PriestPriest of Hildesheim, Germany
25 Jun 178435.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany
25 Jun 178435.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Basilinopolis
10 Oct 178435.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Basilinopolis
21 Jan 182576.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany

MicroData Summary for Karl Friedrich von Wendt
Bishop Karl Friedrich von Wendt (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 40.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1784, Number 29
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 117, and Page 452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016