Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Francesco Franchi

Deceased

Bishop of Penne e Atri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1737BornChieti
28 May 176326.3Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 179558.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Tremithus
15 Nov 179558.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tremithus
26 Jun 180568.4AppointedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
Nov 1815³78.7DiedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicola Francesco Franchi
Bishop Nicola Francesco Franchi (born , died Nov 1815) Bishop of Penne e Atri

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 414
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 302
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1795, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 28 Feb 2016