Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Forte, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Avellino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1928BornPolla
1 Oct 194416.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
25 Feb 195122.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
11 Jun 198859.9AppointedBishop of Ariano Irpino-Lacedonia, Italy
10 Sep 198860.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ariano Irpino-Lacedonia, Italy
20 Feb 199364.6AppointedBishop of Avellino, Italy
13 Nov 200476.3RetiredBishop of Avellino, Italy
11 Sep 200678.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Avellino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Forte:
Bishop Antonio Forte O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Avellino

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 10,017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,126
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013