Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ludovico Cardinal Flangini Giovanelli

Deceased

Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1733BornVenezia
3 Aug 178956.0Elevated to Cardinal
14 Dec 178956.4InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano
28 Mar 179056.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Feb 179460.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
179965.4Ordained PriestPriest
2 Apr 180066.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
14 Nov 180168.3SelectedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
23 Dec 180168.4ConfirmedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
14 Mar 180268.6Ordained BishopPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
24 May 180268.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
29 Feb 180470.6DiedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ludovico Flangini Giovanelli:
Cardinal Ludovico Flangini Giovanelli (born , died ) Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}

  • a priest for 5.2 years
  • a bishop for 2.0 years
  • a cardinal for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations piscopales
  • b/c2: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 3 Aug 1789
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 391

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013