Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefano Solis Castelblanco, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sarno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1580¹BornNapoli
22 Oct 161838.8AppointedBishop of Sarno, Italy
4 Nov 161838.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sarno, Italy
21 Oct 165777.8DiedBishop of Sarno, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stefano Solis Castelblanco:
Bishop Stefano Solis Castelblanco C.R. (born 1580, died ) Bishop of Sarno

  • a bishop for 38.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 306
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 65, Number 376
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1618, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015