Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludovico Ferretti, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1866BornPietrasanta
18 Nov 192761.6AppointedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
4 Dec 192761.6Ordained BishopBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
5 Apr 193064.0DiedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ludovico Ferretti:
Bishop Ludovico Ferretti O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa

  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1927, Number 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013