Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felipe Fernández García

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1935BornSan Pedro de Trones
28 Jul 195721.9Ordained PriestPriest of Plasencia, Spain
22 Oct 197641.1AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
28 Nov 197641.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ávila, Spain
12 Jun 199155.8AppointedBishop of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife, Spain
25 Jul 199155.9InstalledBishop of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife, Spain
29 Jun 200569.8ResignedBishop of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife, Spain
6 Apr 201276.6DiedBishop Emeritus of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife, Spain

MicroData Summary for Felipe Fernández García:
Bishop Felipe Fernández García (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 35.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123
  • d: CB, 6 Apr 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 2 Mar 2014