Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignác Fábry

Deceased

Bishop of Košice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1792BornSátoraljaujhelyi, Hungary
31 Aug 181422.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 Aug 181523.0Ordained PriestPriest
5 Feb 185259.5SelectedBishop of Košice, Slovakia
27 Sep 185260.2ConfirmedBishop of Košice, Slovakia
30 Nov 185260.3Ordained BishopBishop of Košice, Slovakia
24 Jun 186774.9DiedBishop of Košice, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Ignác Fábry:
Bishop Ignác Fábry (born , died ) Bishop of Košice

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 189

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013